## Aug 29, 2015

### Vedic Maths #02: Multiplication by 999.... [with same number of digits]

Following method will give you easy way to multiply a number with 9's.  After learning this method you can easily do
1. 12 x 99
2. 234 x 999
3. 6316 x 9999 and so on...

Note this method is applied to numbers with same number of digits in them. Other variation are covered later.

Let's take an example of 234 * 999. Do try it on piece of paper using the usual method of multiplication.

Vedic Method is as follows. Answer is calculated in two parts and later combined together to get the final answer.

To know what is 10's complement you can refer (Vedic Maths #01: Complement method - Subtraction from 100/1000/10000). Here is mathematical analysis of the same.

Lets take a generic number xyz, and we need to do
xyz * 999

xyz value can be written as x * 100 + y * 10 + z * 1

= (100x + 10y + z) * 999
= (100x + 10y + z) * (1000 - 1)
= 100000x + 10000y + 1000z - 100x - 10y - z
= 100000x + 10000y + 1000(z - 1) + 1000 - 100x - 10y - z
= 100000x + 10000y + 1000(z - 1) + (1000 - xyz)
= 100000x + 10000y + 1000(z - 1) + (1000 - xyz)
= 1000(100x + 10y + (z - 1)) + (1000 - xyz)
= 1000(xy[z-1]) + 10's complement of xyz

This applies to number as big as 3450534 * 9999999.

Next Article - Vedic Maths #03: Multiplication by 999.... [with greater number of digits]
Previous Article - Vedic Maths #01: Complement method - Subtraction from 100/1000/10000
All Article - Vedic Maths

1. Great job for publishing such a nice article. Your article isn’t only useful but it is additionally really informative. Thank you because you have been willing to share information with us. What Is A Reflection In Geometry

2. The main focus will be on learning different techniques in solving word problems.Once the techniques are in place, solving word problems would be a breeze.
PSLE tuition
PSLE math tuition online
PSLE english tuition online
PSLE science tuition online
English tuition singapore
Science tuition singapore
Maths tuition singapore
Primary PSLE Tuition Singapore

3. 4. Thank you for your awesome service to the child. During early and middle childhood, the brain forms and refines a complex network of connections in the brain through synaptogenesis, pruning, and myelination. The process of forming connections is biologically driven, but experiences also promote synapse formation.
concentration exercise for student
child concentration exercise in Chennai
maths tuition in Chennai
right brain training in Chennai
kids brain training in Chennai
memory improvement technique in Chennai
brain development training in Chennai